THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:00:32 PM
Stolee, Kathrine Joan
CPSO#:
57403
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jul 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
33 Drummond St W
Perth ON K7H 2K1
Phone: 613 267 1500
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Kathrine Stolee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 14 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital |
Perth |
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site |
Smiths Falls |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KATHRINE JOAN STOLEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STOLEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 1987 |