THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 16:06:22 PM
Berg, Gregory Mark Alexander
CPSO#:
57385
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jun 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
First Floor - Superior Place
264 McNabb St.
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 1Y6
Phone: (705) 254-5980
Fax: (705) 254-6969
Electoral District: 08
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Greg Berg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 28 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake |
Elliot Lake |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:24 Nov 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GREGORY MARK ALEXANDER BERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERG is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1987 |