THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 0:06:14 AM
Hiscock, Susan Leslie
CPSO#:
57384
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jan 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jan 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Box 160
268 Maiden Lane
St Marys ON N4X 1B1
Phone: (519) 284-1280
Fax: (519) 284-4816
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Mary's Memorial Hospital |
St Marys |
Stratford General Hospital |
Stratford |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Jun 1997 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUSAN LESLIE HISCOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HISCOCK is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Dec 1987 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 04 Oct 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 1990 |