THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:20:13 AM
McNamara, Brian Thompson
CPSO#:
57383
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Nov 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Nov 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
206-430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2T 0C1
Phone: 519-741-5252
Fax: 519-741-5772
Electoral District: 03
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Texas
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:04 Jun 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:25 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRIAN THOMPSON MCNAMARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNAMARA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Jul 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Nov 2009 |