THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 6:31:11 AM
McFaul, Susan Mary
CPSO#:
57373
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jun 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Susan McFaul Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 1 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Paitents from the closed practice of 201 - 1919 Riverside Dr Ottawa ON K1H 1A2, may obtain a copy of their medical records by sending a request to:
c/o Dr, Pamela Berger
201 - 1919 Riverside Dr Ottawa ON K1H 1A2
Tel: 613-795-573
Fax: 613-728-4480
Date Received: 25 Feb 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nunavut
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:01 Jun 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1986 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2021 |