THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 11:16:45 AM
Meehan, Anne Rankin
CPSO#:
57339
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jan 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
2530 St Joseph Boulevard
Orléans ON K1C 1G1
Phone: (613) 830-5888
Fax: (613) 830-1791
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Anne Meehan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 18 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1988 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANNE RANKIN MEEHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEEHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 1988 to 30 Sep 1988
CF - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 1988 |