THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 22:51:10 PM
Kovacs, Michael Joseph
CPSO#:
57333
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jan 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
800 Commissioner Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 52254
Fax: 519-685-8294
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 Jun 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:19 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOSEPH KOVACS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOVACS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Hematological Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jan 1988 |