THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 0:03:17 AM
Hurst, David Edward
CPSO#:
57317
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Apr 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
415 Scotia Street
Schreiber ON P0T 2S0
Phone: (807) 824-2934
Fax: (807) 824-2758
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
McCausland Hospital |
Terrace Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID EDWARD HURST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HURST is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 1987 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 12 Oct 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1990 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 28 Feb 1998 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 30 Apr 1998 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 01 Dec 1997
Summary:
In December 1997, Dr. Hurst pleaded guilty to the charge of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional as defined in paragraph 1(1)33 of Regulation 856/93. The Discipline Committee accepted his plea, and found Dr. Hurst guilty of professional misconduct. The Committee imposed the following penalty:
1) that Dr. Hurst was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.
2) that Dr. Hurst s certificate of registration shall be suspended for eight weeks, on a date to be fixed by the Registrar, before March 1, 1998. The suspension shall be removed after eight weeks upon compliance with the following terms and conditions:
a) that Dr. Hurst has completed sessions in the management of clinical boundaries and the management of boundary violations with Dr. ____ until Dr. ______ is satisfied that further sessions are not necessary; and
b) that Dr. Hurst has instructed Dr. ____ to report, and Dr. ___has reported, to the Registrar. This report will include Dr. ___ s assessment, the nature of the intervention and his satisfaction with the outcome in terms of D. Hurst s understanding and management of clinical boundaries and boundary violations.
c) that Dr. Hurst has started a course of treatment by a certified psychiatrist or a psychologist who is a member of the College of Psychologists of Ontario,
acceptable to the Registrar, who is knowledgeable about the facts resulting in the finding of professional misconduct in this order, and who agrees to provide reports acceptable to the Registrar six months and one year after the start of the treatment program; and
d) that Dr. Hurst has agreed to continue in the treatment program and follow the advice of the psychiatrist or psychologist, for as long as the psychiatrist or
psychologist considers treatment to be advisable.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Dec 01, 1997