THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:47:10 AM
Winquist, Eric William
CPSO#:
57309
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Nov 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Nov 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: (519) 685-8808
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 Jun 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:02 Sep 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERIC WILLIAM WINQUIST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINQUIST is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 1987 |