THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 1:27:20 AM
Bauer, Robert David Charles
CPSO#:
57297
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jun 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Cardiovascular Center
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 245-1150
Fax: (416) 245-1166
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Robert Bauer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 18 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:22 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT DAVID CHARLES BAUER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAUER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 1988 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Dec 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 1992 |