THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 15:03:46 PM
Brennan, Michael Charles
CPSO#:
57289
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 May 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON L2R 6P9
Phone: (905) 684-7271
Fax: (905) 984-5578
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL CHARLES BRENNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRENNAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 May 1992 |