THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 4:29:38 AM
Chadha, Ashok Kumar
CPSO#:
57279
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
18 Apr 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Delhi, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Chadha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 2 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Medical Record requests should be directed to: DOCUdavit Solutions, at 1-888-781-9083.
Date Received: 30 Aug 2023
Instructions/Address:EMR at Medical Tree Clinic, 795 Gardiners Road Unit 6, Kingston ON K7M 7E6
Date Received: 02 Jun 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 04 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 1992 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Apr 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 18 Apr 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Aug 2019 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2022 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: August 20, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Dr. Ashok Kumar Chadha to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 20, 2019:
An assessment was conducted on Dr. Chadha’s family medicine practice. The assessment report received by the College raised concerns about his family medicine practice. As a result:
Dr. Chadha will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.
Dr. Chadha will engage in professional education in a variety of topics including in antibiotic use, medical record-keeping, and recommendations for cancer screening.
Dr. Chadha’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 3 months of the completion of the Clinical Supervision and education.
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: April 18, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:
Download Full Document (PDF)