THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 5:42:12 AM
Redmond, Mary Linda
CPSO#:
57275
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1910 St. Laurent Blvd
CareMedics Elmvale
Ottawa ON K1G 1A4
Phone: 613 736 6688
Fax: 613-523-5580
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:17 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:20 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARY LINDA REDMOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REDMOND is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1991 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: September 11, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective March 12, 2020, Dr. Redmond has completed all components of her SCERP.
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.
Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)