THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 1:02:53 AM
O'Brien, Terrence Owen
CPSO#:
57257
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Feb 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Center
Department of Emergency Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Kingston, ON
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2368
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:27 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TERRENCE OWEN O'BRIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BRIEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Feb 1988 |