THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 10:15:25 AM
Bialik, Mark Joseph
CPSO#:
57253
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
26 Mar 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jul 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit #5
737 Siver Seven Road
Capital Kidz Medical Clinic
Kanata ON K2V 0A3
Phone: (613) 828-3122
Electoral District: 07
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking access to a copy or transfer of their medical record can make their request through Dr. Bialik’s website: drmarkbialik.com.
Date Received: 26 Feb 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:05 Jun 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Mar 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Jul 1987 |
|
Active |