THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 10:44:10 AM
Martin, Deborah Lynn
CPSO#:
57239
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jun 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Feb 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Drysdale, Deborah Lynn (used until: 09 Sep 1986 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
B-526 Bryne Dr
Barrie ON L4N 9P6
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: D.L. Martin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 3 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1988 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:05 Dec 1994 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DEBORAH LYNN MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Feb 1988 |