THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:10:39 AM
Desai, Devanshu Dolatrai
CPSO#:
57231
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Dec 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi
Education: Gujarat University, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1281 St Clair Ave W
Reconnect Community Health Services
Toronto ON M6E 1B8
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:07 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DEVANSHU DOLATRAI DESAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESAI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Nov 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1991 |