THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 23:26:10 PM
Taylor, Mary May
CPSO#:
57219
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
24 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Aug 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Mary M. Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 13 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Contact above
Docudavit Solutions Inc
28 Eugene St
Toronto ON
M6B 3Z4
Phone: 1 888 781 9083
Fax: 1 866 297 9338
Date Received: 24 Aug 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Aug 2017 |