THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 6:24:03 AM
Blakslee, James Michael
CPSO#:
57210
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jul 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kemptville District Hospital |
Kemptville |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Winchester District Memorial Hospital |
Winchester |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:04 Nov 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES MICHAEL BLAKSLEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAKSLEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1987 |