THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 12:11:28 PM
Stringer, David Glenn
CPSO#:
57205
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jun 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jan 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Centenary Health Centre
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 281-7454
Fax: (416) 281-7453
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:21 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID GLENN STRINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRINGER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 31 Dec 1987
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 1989 |