THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 5:27:49 AM
Hessian, Renee Cynthia
CPSO#:
57193
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Aug 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON K9J 7C6
Phone: (613) 696-7313
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:06 Jun 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:26 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RENEE CYNTHIA HESSIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HESSIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 1988 |