THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 15:49:28 PM
Chan, Michael Chun-Keung
CPSO#:
57190
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jan 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Chan, Chun Keung (used until: 21 Dec 1994 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: Queen's University, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 407
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 287-1943
Fax: (416) 283-4083
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:12 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:05 Sep 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL CHUN-KEUNG CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Cardiothoracic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 6 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 1988 |