THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 6:30:53 AM
Pantazi, Sophia
CPSO#:
57183
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jun 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jul 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Greek
Education: University of Toronto, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017
Corporation Name: P.Stroz & S.Pantazi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 3 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 May 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SOPHIA PANTAZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANTAZI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1988 |