THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 23:44:39 PM
Keating, Frances Mary
CPSO#:
57171
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Mar 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Mar 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
O'Neil, Frances Mary (used until: 27 May 2007 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North Shore Health Network |
Blind River |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Mar 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FRANCES MARY KEATING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEATING is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 1991 |