THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 11:54:55 AM
Litchfield, Robert Bruce
CPSO#:
57162
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Dec 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1151 Richmond Street
University of Western Ontario
London ON N6A 3K7
Phone: (519) 661-4156
Fax: (519) 850-2497
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited |
Toronto |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital |
Huntsville |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:19 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT BRUCE LITCHFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITCHFIELD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Dec 1987 |