THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 23:50:00 PM
Hepburn, Douglas Stuart
CPSO#:
57159
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
26 Apr 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jun 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Douglas Hepburn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 25 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:05 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Sep 1990
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1990 to 30 Mar 1991
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Apr 2023 |