THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 18:47:40 PM
Fuss, Jeffrey William
CPSO#:
57145
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jun 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Feb 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
JW Fuss Medicine Prof Corp
E1 102
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: 5196676538
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Campbellford Memorial Hospital |
Campbellford |
Clinton Public Hospital |
Clinton |
Four Counties Health Services |
Newbury |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Lions Head Site |
Lions Head |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site |
Markdale |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital |
Southampton |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site |
Wiarton |
Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation |
Haliburton |
Lake of the Woods District Hospital |
Kenora |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Pembroke Regional Hospital |
Pembroke |
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft |
Bancroft |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre |
Kincardine |
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake |
Elliot Lake |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
St Mary's Memorial Hospital |
St Marys |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:13 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEFFREY WILLIAM FUSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUSS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Emergency Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Emergency Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 1987 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Oct 2021 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 07 Oct 2021 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Feb 2022 |