THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 17:30:35 PM
Chiba, Naoki
CPSO#:
57136
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Aug 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Aug 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Japanese
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
601 Elmwood Ave
Rochester ON 14642-0002
United States
Phone: 5852754711
Fax: 5852760101
Electoral District: 01
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Naoki Chiba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 29 2019
Corporation Name: Naoki Chiba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 3 2023
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Prince Edward Island
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:19 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NAOKI CHIBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIBA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Nov 1987 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 04 Sep 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 2021 |