THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 11:09:17 AM
Bhatnagar, Gopal
CPSO#:
57129
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Aug 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cleveland Clinic Abu Dhabi
Al Maryha island
8-C256
Abu Dhabi 1001
United Arab Emirates
Phone: 971508862720
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Gopal Bhatnagar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 27 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Arab Emirates
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:12 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiothoracic Surgery |
Effective:31 Dec 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GOPAL BHATNAGAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHATNAGAR is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 1988 |