THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 15:39:19 PM
Tomen, Mark Edward
CPSO#:
57115
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
226 Wellington Street West
Chatham ON N7M 1J6
Phone: (519) 352-1250
Fax: (519) 351-4434
Electoral District: 01
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Mark Tomen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 22 2013
Corporation Name: M.E. Tomen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 11 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARK EDWARD TOMEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOMEN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1987 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Dec 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 07 Dec 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 20 Dec 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 29 Mar 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 23 Oct 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 22 Jun 2021 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 2022 |