THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 2:22:33 AM
Sehdev, Sandeep Raj
CPSO#:
57055
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jun 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jun 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: University of Ottawa, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 70179
Fax: (613) 247-3511
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 Jun 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:05 Sep 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SANDEEP RAJ SEHDEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEHDEV is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Jul 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1992 |