THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 8:35:20 AM
Thompson, Penelope Jane
CPSO#:
56996
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Oct 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
170 Rockhaven Lane
Unit 103
Waterdown ON L8B 1B5
Phone: (905) 689-9499
Fax: 905 689-5284
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:29 May 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PENELOPE JANE THOMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMPSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Oct 1987 |