THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 0:35:31 AM
Brill, Francine
CPSO#:
56969
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
25 Apr 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS - Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc
111 St. Regis Crescent S
Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
2020 records:
250 Harding Blvd
Suite 404
Richmond Hill, ON L4C9M7 (EMR P.S Suites)
Date Received: 25 Apr 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:29 May 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1990 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Apr 2022 |