THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 8:37:32 AM
Wilkins, Margaret Ann
CPSO#:
56968
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Sep 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: M. A. Wilkins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Box 1346, Lakefield, ON K0L 2H0
Date Received: 19 May 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1988 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |