THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 10:11:52 AM
Lougheed, Merla Diane
CPSO#:
56947
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Apr 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
102 Stuart Street
Richardson House
Kingston ON K7L 2V6
Phone: (613) 548-2348
Fax: (613) 549-1459
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Providence Care Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:04 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:19 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MERLA DIANE LOUGHEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUGHEED is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Respirology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Respirology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
CF - Respirology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Aug 1993
CF - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Apr 1988 |