THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 22:28:27 PM
Harvey, Janice Anne
CPSO#:
56941
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
06 Dec 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Sep 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
6-Dec-2023
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Jun 1990 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 1989 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 06 Dec 2023 |