THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 8:51:07 AM
Fisher, Susan Catherine
CPSO#:
56939
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jan 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
629 Rue Principale
Casselman ON K0A 1M0
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1988 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUSAN CATHERINE FISHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISHER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Oct 1988
Resident 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 1988 |