THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:42:44 AM
Dunsmuir, James Thomas Moonlight
CPSO#:
56938
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
10 Aug 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Nov 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Dunsmuir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 9 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:05 Jun 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Aug 2021 |