THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 1:26:33 AM
Barrett, Elizabeth Ada
CPSO#:
56931
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jun 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Sep 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1988 |
CFPC Specialist |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Dec 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:26 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
FCFP - Family Medicine |
Effective:29 Oct 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ADA BARRETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRETT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2004 to 12 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2005 to 12 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2006 to 12 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 07 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 1987 |