THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 23:20:42 PM
Boyd, Barbara Joan
CPSO#:
56908
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Aug 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Meske, Barbara Joan (used until: 15 Jul 1987 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Barbara J. Boyd Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 30 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:04 - 99 Kakulu Road , Kanata , ON K2L 3C8
Date Received: 30 May 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1988 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2022 |