THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:48:33 AM
Kirwin, Pierre Joseph
CPSO#:
56903
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Aug 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Oakdale Professional Medical Centre
2065 Finch Avenue West
Suite 402
North York ON M3N 2V7
Phone: (416) 745-2314
Fax: (416) 745-9336
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:07 Sep 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PIERRE JOSEPH KIRWIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRWIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 1987 |