THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 6:09:43 AM
Webb, Janet Linda
CPSO#:
56892
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Feb 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Feb 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Tri Area Medical Centre
52 St Lawrence Street East
Madoc ON K0K 2K0
Phone: (613) 473-4134
Fax: (613) 473-4740
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1988 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JANET LINDA WEBB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBB is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Aug 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Feb 2004 |