THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 8:52:29 AM
Watt, Peter Douglas
CPSO#:
56891
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Apr 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
679 Davis Dr
Suite 102
Newmarket ON L3Y 5G8
Phone: 905-836-7100
Fax: 905-836-7062
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:31 May 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER DOUGLAS WATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1987 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Apr 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: August 16, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)