THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 14:43:51 PM
Sullivan, William Francis
CPSO#:
56881
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jun 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. William F. Sullivan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 5 2024
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Dec 1997 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WILLIAM FRANCIS SULLIVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULLIVAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 May 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Oct 1997
CF - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1987 |