THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:33:23 PM
Psarakis, Stella
CPSO#:
56859
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
20 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Aug 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
20-Jun-2018
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: University of Toronto, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Stella Psarakis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 26 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:28 May 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Dec 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 1987 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 20 Jun 2018 |