THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:20:44 PM
McLennan, Michael Kenneth
CPSO#:
56836
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jun 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
P O Box 1800
Markham ON L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7611
Fax: (905) 472-7078
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Atikokan General Hospital |
Atikokan |
Dryden Regional Health Centre |
Dryden |
Geraldton District Hospital |
Geraldton |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Norfolk General Hospital |
Simcoe |
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital |
Uxbridge |
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities |
Rainy River |
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital |
Red Lake |
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre |
Sioux Lookout |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:25 May 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL KENNETH MCLENNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLENNAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1987 |