THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 18:15:18 PM
Marks, Paul Howard
CPSO#:
56832
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jun 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
M G 350
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6838
Fax: (416) 480-6840
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:20 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAUL HOWARD MARKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARKS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 1991 to 30 Sep 1991
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1987 |