THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 11:37:56 AM
Manassis, Katharina Marie
CPSO#:
56828
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
04 Apr 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Jul 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: University of Toronto, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. K. Manassis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 18 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Medical records location as per above.
471 Rougemount Dr
Pickering, ON L1W 2B8
Date Received: 04 Apr 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:06 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Apr 2018 |