THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 17:26:08 PM
Mahoney, John Eric
CPSO#:
56827
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jun 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Aug 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa General Hospital
Box 222
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8030
Fax: (613) 737-8982
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nunavut
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bruyere Continuing Care |
Ottawa |
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital |
Hawkesbury |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:15 Sep 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN ERIC MAHONEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHONEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Urology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
CF - Medical Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Aug 1987 |