THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 15:26:12 PM
Kruczynski, Krystyna Helen
CPSO#:
56795
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jun 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jul 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: University of Toronto, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: 8336850717
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:03 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KRYSTYNA HELEN KRUCZYNSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRUCZYNSKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 1987 |